Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Hoenen, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1919Born
8 Aug 194828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 Jul 196343.6AppointedBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Oct 196343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Apr 197454.4ResignedBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Dec 199778.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François Hoenen
Bishop François Hoenen S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocherath, Belgium

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast