Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kouassivi Vieira

Deceased

Bishop of Djougou, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1949Born
29 Jun 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lokossa, Benin
10 Jun 199545.9AppointedBishop of Djougou, Benin
1 Oct 199546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Djougou, Benin
21 Mar 201969.6DiedBishop of Djougou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Paul Kouassivi Vieira (VIAF: 78105638)
Bishop Paul Kouassivi Vieira (born , died ) Bishop of Djougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgoué, Diocese of Lokossa
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopDjougou, Diocese of Djougou
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Sacré-Cœur, Cathedral, Djougou, Diocese of Djougou

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,670
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2019
  • loc: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast