Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José García Villas, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1910Born
11 Mar 193323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jul 196353.4AppointedBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
20 Oct 196353.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
10 Aug 196555.5DiedBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for José García Villas
Bishop José García Villas C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of San Pedro Sula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Lecina, Spain

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast