Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu Kanyama

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1917Born
5 May 194628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Dec 196851.1AppointedBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jan 196951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Nov 199578.0RetiredBishop of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Oct 200587.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kabinda, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Kanyama
Bishop Matthieu Kanyama (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kabinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMusangye

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast