Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Umberto Cardinal Colombo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1902Born
1 Nov 192522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milano {Milan}, Italy
29 May 192623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
25 Oct 196057.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
25 Oct 196057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
7 Dec 196058.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
10 Aug 196360.6AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 Oct 196360.8InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Feb 196562.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196562.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
29 Dec 197977.0RetiredArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 May 199289.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Umberto Colombo (VIAF: 32102657)
Giovanni Umberto Cardinal Colombo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaronno Pertusella, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant'Ambrogio, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Duomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 121
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • od: AM, 18 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 528, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,095, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Sep 2020

Quantcast