Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Laba Ladjar, O.F.M.

Bishop of Jayapura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1943 BornBauraja
29 Jun 197531.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Dec 199350.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jayapura, Indonesia
6 Dec 199350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
10 Apr 199450.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
29 Aug 199753.8AppointedBishop of Jayapura, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Leo Laba Ladjar:
Bishop Leo Laba Ladjar O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Jayapura

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jayapura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013