Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo García Naranjo

Bishop of Guarenas, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1944 Born
29 Jun 197530.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 199652.4AppointedBishop of Guarenas, Venezuela
11 Jan 199752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guarenas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Gustavo García Naranjo
Bishop Gustavo García Naranjo (born ) Bishop of Guarenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast