Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabás Magaña García

Deceased

Bishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1921BornMorelia
23 Sep 194423.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 196847.9AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
6 Jan 196948.0Ordained BishopBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
7 Nov 199069.8DiedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Sabás Magaña García:
Bishop Sabás Magaña García (born , died ) Bishop of Matamoros

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013