Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Mandin Bastes, S.V.D.

Bishop of Sorsogon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1944 BornLoboc
28 Nov 197026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
3 Jul 199753.2AppointedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
21 Aug 199753.3Ordained BishopBishop of Romblon, Philippines
25 Jul 200258.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
16 Apr 200359.0SucceededBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Arturo Mandin Bastes:
Bishop Arturo Mandin Bastes S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Sorsogon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sorsogon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015