Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Maimone, S.A.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1932 Born
29 Jun 196128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
12 Jun 197340.6AppointedBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
29 Jun 197340.7Ordained BishopBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
8 May 200269.5ResignedBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maria Maimone (VIAF: 1151302806648660089)
Bishop José Maria Maimone S.A.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Umuarama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAstolfo Dutra
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umuarama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,190
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast