Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Raúl Martorell

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1945 Born
29 Jun 197025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
3 Oct 200661.5AppointedBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
8 Dec 200661.7Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
8 May 202075.1RetiredBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Raúl Martorell
Bishop Marcelo Raúl Martorell (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Iguazú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalta
Ordained BishopStade de Liga Regional de Fútbol, Puerto Iguazú, Diocese of Puerto Iguazú

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Iguazú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,291
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast