Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Casaroli

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto-Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1914BornCastel San Giovanni
27 May 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
29 Jun 196752.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
4 Jul 196752.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
16 Jul 196752.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
28 Apr 197964.4AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
30 Jun 197964.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
30 Jun 197964.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 197964.6AppointedSecretary of State
1 Jul 197964.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
30 Jan 198166.2AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
17 Nov 198268.0RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
8 Apr 198469.4ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
25 May 198570.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1 Dec 199076.0RetiredSecretary of State
9 Jun 199883.5DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Agostino Casaroli:
Agostino Cardinal Casaroli (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 May 2014