Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Jérôme Cardinal Hamer, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Cardinal-Priest of San Saba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1916BornBruxelles, Belgium
3 Aug 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Apr 196952.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
14 Jun 197357.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lorium
14 Jun 197357.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
29 Jun 197357.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lorium
8 Apr 198467.9AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
25 May 198569.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Saba
25 May 198569.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198569.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
21 Jan 199275.6RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
29 Jan 199679.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Saba
2 Dec 199680.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Jean Jérôme Hamer:
Cardinal Jean Jérôme Hamer O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013