Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Baptist Matthijs Gijsen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Reykjavik, Iceland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1932Born
6 Apr 195724.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 197239.2AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
13 Feb 197239.3Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
23 Jan 199360.2ResignedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
3 Apr 199360.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Traiectum ad Mosam
12 Oct 199563.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Reykjavik, Iceland
24 May 199663.6AppointedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
30 Oct 200775.0RetiredBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
24 Jun 201380.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Reykjavik, Iceland

MicroData Summary for Joannes Baptist Matthijs Gijsen (VIAF: 56603172)
Bishop Joannes Baptist Matthijs Gijsen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Reykjavik

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOeffelt
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSittard, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2007
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 904

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast