Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Cardinal Tong Hon

Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

Cardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum

Member of the Secretariat for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1939 BornHong Kong
6 Jan 196626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
13 Sep 199657.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
13 Sep 199657.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bossa
9 Dec 199657.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bossa
30 Jan 200868.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
15 Apr 200969.7SucceededBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
18 Feb 201272.5Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201272.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum
22 Apr 201272.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum
8 Mar 201474.6AppointedMember of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for John Tong Hon:
John Cardinal Tong Hon (born ) Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,870
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1r01: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014