Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Richard Cote

Bishop of Norwich, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1949 BornSanford
29 Jun 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Portland, Maine, USA
9 May 199545.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
9 May 199545.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cebarades
27 Jul 199546.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cebarades
11 Mar 200353.7AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
14 May 200353.9InstalledBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Richard Cote:
Bishop Michael Richard Cote (born ) Bishop of Norwich

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Norwich.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013