Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Evariste Van Rengen, C.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mweka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1914BornMol, Belgium
6 Aug 193925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of the Josephites of Belgium
11 Jan 195742.9AppointedPrefect of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Sep 196450.6AppointedBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Dec 196450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Mar 198874.1DiedBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Marcel Evariste Van Rengen:
Bishop Marcel Evariste Van Rengen C.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Mweka

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013