Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile Njeru

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eldoret

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1930BornKevote
195828.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 196939.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eldoret, Kenya
22 May 196939.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
1 Aug 196939.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
5 Sep 197040.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eldoret, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Emile Njeru:
Bishop Emile Njeru (born 1930, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eldoret

  • a priest for 12.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015