Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin Guirma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kaya, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1920Born
19 May 194626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kaya, Burkina Faso
26 Jun 196949.3AppointedBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
1 Aug 196949.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
9 Mar 199676.0RetiredBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
6 Aug 201090.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kaya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Constantin Guirma
Bishop Constantin Guirma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaya

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast