Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Bosco Vivas Robelo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1941Born
17 May 197028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
8 Oct 198139.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
8 Oct 198139.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mididi
21 Nov 198140.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mididi
2 Apr 199149.3AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
29 Jun 201977.6RetiredBishop of León en Nicaragua
23 Jun 202078.6DiedBishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for César Bosco Vivas Robelo (VIAF: 14152820075400680627)
Bishop César Bosco Vivas Robelo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasaya
Death PlaceFernando Veléis Paiz, Hospital, Managua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2019
  • d: CB, 23 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Jun 2020

Quantcast