Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Joseph-Augustin Pasquier, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1924Born
19 Feb 195025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 May 196944.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Garoua, Cameroon
29 May 196944.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
1 Aug 196945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
19 Nov 198258.3AppointedBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
23 Oct 200076.2RetiredBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
7 Mar 200479.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Joseph-Augustin Pasquier
Bishop Jean-Marie-Joseph-Augustin Pasquier O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ngaoundéré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Macaire-en-Mauges, France

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018