Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Saminini Arulappa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hyderabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1924Born
6 May 195025.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 197147.2AppointedArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
13 Feb 197247.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
29 Jan 200075.4RetiredArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
13 Feb 200580.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Saminini Arulappa
Archbishop Saminini Arulappa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilacherry

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018