Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Luís Bossi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Parnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1908Born
23 Jul 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Jun 195849.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
18 Jun 195849.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Parnassus
14 Sep 195850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parnassus
19 Feb 196657.6SucceededPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
22 Aug 197062.1ResignedPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
8 May 200293.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Luís Bossi
Bishop Adolfo Luís Bossi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSesto San Giovanni, Italy

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast