Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Józef Zawistowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łomża, Poland

Titular Bishop of Hospita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1930Born
3 Jul 195525.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 197343.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
12 May 197343.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hospita
29 Jun 197343.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hospita
11 Feb 200676.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
1 Jun 201585.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Józef Zawistowski (VIAF: 303324187)
Bishop Tadeusz Józef Zawistowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSztabin

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • d: CB, 1 Jun 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast