Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Max John Rodrigues

Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad in Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1938 Born
6 Jan 196627.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199961.5AppointedBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
25 Mar 200061.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
16 Dec 201476.5RetiredBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Max John Rodrigues
Bishop Max John Rodrigues (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad in Pakistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hyderabad in Pakistan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,723
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast