Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patelisio Punou-Ki-Hihifo Finau, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1934Born
21 Jul 195925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
15 Oct 197137.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Oct 197137.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
13 Feb 197237.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
7 Apr 197238.0SucceededBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Oct 199359.5DiedBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary
Patelisio Punou-Ki-Hihifo Finau
Bishop Patelisio Punou-Ki-Hihifo Finau S.M.
(born , died )
Bishop of Tonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMa'ufanga
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025