Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Evariste Ngoyagoye

Archbishop Emeritus of Bujumbura, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1942 Born
6 Jan 196624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bujumbura, Burundi
7 Jun 198038.4AppointedBishop of Bubanza, Burundi
24 Aug 198038.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bubanza, Burundi
21 Apr 199755.2AppointedBishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
25 Nov 200664.8AppointedArchbishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
24 Mar 201876.2RetiredArchbishop of Bujumbura, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Evariste Ngoyagoye
Archbishop Evariste Ngoyagoye (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bujumbura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJenda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bujumbura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast