Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Khiamsun Nittayo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangkok


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1908BornLamsai
21 Dec 193527.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 196355.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand
13 Sep 196355.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
20 Oct 196355.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
29 Apr 196556.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand
18 Dec 196557.5AppointedArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
18 Dec 197264.5ResignedArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
2 Oct 199890.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bangkok, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Khiamsun Nittayo:
Archbishop Joseph Khiamsun Nittayo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangkok

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015