Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baptist Mudartha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1911BornMangalore
21 Dec 194231.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 196351.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jhansi, India
6 Jul 196351.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Idebessus
20 Oct 196352.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idebessus
29 Nov 196756.2AppointedBishop of Jhansi, India
1 Mar 197664.5AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
5 May 198876.7RetiredBishop of Allahabad, India
30 May 200795.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Baptist Mudartha:
Bishop Baptist Mudartha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013