Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Oldani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Gergis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1905BornCaidate
2 Jun 192822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
31 Oct 196156.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
31 Oct 196156.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
7 Dec 196156.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
5 Aug 197670.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Oldani:
Bishop Luigi Oldani (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015