Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Appasinghe Paul Perera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kandy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1913BornAlton
24 Aug 193925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kandy, Sri Lanka
17 May 197359.5AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
29 Jun 197359.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
13 Jul 197359.6InstalledBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
17 Mar 198369.3RetiredBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
16 May 198975.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kandy, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Appasinghe Paul Perera:
Bishop Appasinghe Paul Perera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kandy

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 301
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 19 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013