Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesário Alexandre Minali, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Achyraus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1897Born
2 Jun 192830.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Mar 195557.3AppointedPrelate of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
1 Mar 195557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Achyraus
5 Jun 195557.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achyraus
9 Apr 195860.4AppointedPrelate of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
13 Jun 196971.5DiedPrelate of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cesário Alexandre Minali
Bishop Cesário Alexandre Minali O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate of Carolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColognola al Piano, Italy

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast