Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Prathan Sridarunsil, S.D.B.

Bishop of Surat Thani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1946 BornWat Phleng
2 Oct 196519.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jun 197529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Oct 200458.7AppointedBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand
28 Nov 200458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Prathan Sridarunsil:
Bishop Joseph Prathan Sridarunsil S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Surat Thani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Surat Thani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,718

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013