Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph McLaughlin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York

Titular Bishop of Motula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1912BornBuffalo
21 Dec 193523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
28 Dec 196856.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
28 Dec 196856.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Motula
6 Jan 196956.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Motula
5 Jan 198875.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
5 Jan 2015102.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph McLaughlin:
Bishop Bernard Joseph McLaughlin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo

  • a priest for 79.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 6 Jan 2015