Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gervasio Gestori

Bishop Emeritus of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1936 Born
28 Jun 195923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Jun 199660.3AppointedBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy
7 Sep 199660.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy
4 Nov 201377.7RetiredBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gervasio Gestori
Bishop Gervasio Gestori (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarlassina, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,786
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast