Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Maggiolini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1931Born
26 Jun 195523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Apr 198351.7AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
29 May 198351.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
31 Jan 198957.5AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
19 Mar 198957.6InstalledBishop of Como, Italy
2 Dec 200675.3RetiredBishop of Como, Italy
11 Nov 200877.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary
Alessandro Maggiolini
Bishop Alessandro Maggiolini
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBareggio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Carpi, Diocese of Carpi
Death PlaceComo, Diocese of Como
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Como, Diocese of Como

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025