Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Muratore

Bishop of Nicosia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1946 Born
17 May 197023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Agrigento, Italy
22 Jan 200962.0AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
25 Mar 200962.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
28 Mar 200962.2InstalledBishop of Nicosia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Muratore
Bishop Salvatore Muratore (born ) Bishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampobello di Licata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nicosia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast