Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Robert Adams

Bishop Emeritus of Oudtshoorn, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1934 Born
6 Jan 196631.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 198348.9AppointedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
16 Jul 198349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
28 May 201076.0RetiredBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Edward Robert Adams
Bishop Edward Robert Adams (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oudtshoorn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRetreat

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oudtshoorn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 May 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 31 Oct 2017