Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Lionel Emmanuel Fernando

Bishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1948 Born
6 Jan 197324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Nov 201163.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Nov 201163.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horta
11 Feb 201263.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horta
22 Nov 201769.5AppointedBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
30 Dec 201769.6InstalledBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Lionel Emmanuel Fernando
Bishop Fidelis Lionel Emmanuel Fernando (born ) Bishop of Mannar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaffna
Ordained BishopSaint Lucia, Cathedral, Colombo, Archdiocese of Colombo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mannar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2012
  • c34: CB, 13 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,259
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2017
  • i: CB, 13 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast