Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barnabas Rugwizangonga Halem ’Imana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kabale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1929BornRulangara
7 Dec 195829.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mbarara, Uganda
1 Feb 196637.0IncardinatedPriest of Kabale, Uganda
29 May 196940.4AppointedBishop of Kabale, Uganda
1 Aug 196940.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kabale, Uganda
15 Jul 199465.5ResignedBishop of Kabale, Uganda
3 Jan 201687.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kabale, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Barnabas Rugwizangonga Halem ’Imana:
Bishop Barnabas Rugwizangonga Halem ’Imana (born 1929, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kabale

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Jan 2016
  • mn: CB, 13 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 13 Jan 2016