Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Melanio Medina Salinas

Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1939 BornFernando de la Mora
17 May 197030.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 198040.7AppointedBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay
10 Aug 198040.8Ordained BishopBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay
8 Jul 199757.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
22 Jul 199959.8SucceededBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Mario Melanio Medina Salinas:
Bishop Mario Melanio Medina Salinas (born ) Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013