Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius XII

Eugenio Maria Giuseppe Giovanni Pacelli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bavaria)


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1876BornRoma
2 Apr 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Jun 191236.2AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
1 Feb 191437.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
20 Apr 191741.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
23 Apr 191741.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
13 May 191741.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sardes
22 Jun 192044.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
16 Dec 192953.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 192953.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
7 Feb 193053.9AppointedSecretary of State
25 Mar 193054.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
1 Apr 193559.0AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
2 Mar 193963.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Mar 193963.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Oct 195882.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Maria Giuseppe Giovanni Pacelli:
Pope Eugenio Maria Giuseppe Giovanni Pacelli (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 23
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014