Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Benjamin Fulton

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1918Born
7 Jun 194123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
28 Dec 196850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
28 Dec 196850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
6 Jan 196950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola
7 Jul 197860.4AppointedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
29 Aug 197860.6InstalledBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
2 Feb 199476.0RetiredBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
11 Nov 200284.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Benjamin Fulton
Bishop Thomas Benjamin Fulton (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Catharines

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast