Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serapio Bwemi Magambo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1928Born
15 Dec 195729.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Portal, Uganda
26 Jun 196941.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
26 Jun 196941.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
1 Aug 196941.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
16 Nov 197244.5AppointedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
17 Jun 199163.1ResignedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
8 Feb 199566.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Serapio Bwemi Magambo
Bishop Serapio Bwemi Magambo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKyaka

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast