Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné M’Sanda Tsinda-Hata

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1935Born
23 Jul 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Apr 197438.7AppointedBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Jun 197438.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Jun 199963.8ResignedBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Oct 200166.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné M’Sanda Tsinda-Hata
Bishop Dieudonné M’Sanda Tsinda-Hata (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMufutufutu
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Nov 2020

Quantcast