Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Menegazzo, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of El Obeid, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Mesarfelta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1931Born
15 Jun 195624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
15 Dec 199564.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
15 Dec 199564.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
3 Mar 199664.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
15 Aug 201078.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
20 Mar 201987.5DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of El Obeid, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Antonio Menegazzo
Bishop Antonio Menegazzo M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of El Obeid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittadella, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Ordained BishopComboni School, El Obeid, Diocese of El Obeid
Death PlaceCittadella, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,738
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast