Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick James Zurek

Bishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1948 Born
29 Jun 197526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Austin, Texas, USA
5 Jan 199849.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
5 Jan 199849.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
16 Feb 199849.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
3 Jan 200859.3AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
22 Feb 200859.5InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick James Zurek
Bishop Patrick James Zurek (born ) Bishop of Amarillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWallis
Ordained BishopMunicipal Auditorium, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amarillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast