Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Augustin Cardinal Mayer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1911BornAltötting, Germany
17 May 193120.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Aug 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 197160.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
6 Jan 197260.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Satrianum
13 Feb 197260.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Satrianum
8 Apr 198472.9AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Sacraments
25 May 198574.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino
25 May 198574.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198574.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacraments
1 Jul 198877.1ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
2 Jul 198877.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
1 Jul 199180.1RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
29 Jan 199684.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anselmo all’Aventino
30 Apr 201098.9DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

MicroData Summary for Paul Augustin Mayer:
Cardinal Paul Augustin Mayer O.S.B. (born , died ) President Emeritus of “Ecclesia Dei”

  • a priest for 74.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
  • a cardinal for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013