Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Norberto Cardinal Rivera Carrera

Archbishop of México, Federal District

Cardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande

Member of the Secretariat for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1942 BornTepehuanes
3 Jul 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
5 Nov 198543.4AppointedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
21 Dec 198543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
13 Jun 199553.0AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
21 Feb 199855.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199855.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande
18 Oct 199856.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande
8 Mar 201471.8AppointedMember of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Norberto Rivera Carrera:
Norberto Cardinal Rivera Carrera (born ) Archbishop of México

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 10 Oct 1998
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jun 2014