Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Costantino Cardinal Patrizi Naro


Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


4 Sep 1798Born
16 Jun 181920.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 182830.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
21 Dec 182830.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
16 Jan 182930.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
19 Jun 182930.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
2 Jul 183233.8AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
23 Jun 183435.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Jul 183637.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 183638.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
6 Jul 183940.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
24 May 184546.7AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
20 Apr 184950.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
27 Jun 185455.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
10 Oct 186062.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
17 Dec 186062.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
21 Sep 186769.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
8 Oct 187072.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
17 Dec 187678.2DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

MicroData Summary for Costantino Patrizi Naro (VIAF: 8129551)
Costantino Cardinal Patrizi Naro (born , died ) Secretary of Universal Inquisition

Birth PlaceSiena, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
  • a cardinal for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 43, and Page 44
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 42
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jul 1836
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 122


Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches


About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018